Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Csi And Ge-Be Frei, Ght Lines, Creative Shippers, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Discovery Distribu, Tion, Distribution Speci, Alists, Discovery Distribu, Tion Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 1987 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE | |
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to BOBBIE R. ALBANESE; ROBERT FULLER returned - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
December 28, 1987 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.