Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Woodland Oaks Apar, Tments, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Penney, Tony, Perez, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 1987 |
Category35: Limited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Matter TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE | |
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to DONALD E. WHARTON, INC returned - ATTEMPTED, NOT KNOWN |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
December 17, 1987 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.