Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Christensen, Kathy, Christensen, Brandon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Gordon'S Kentucky, Groceries, I Nc, Linarez, Randy, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 1987 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Matter TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2006 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADD FIXED CASE Notes: ADD FIXED CASE - BEGIN JBSIS STATS |
|
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: DISM ORDER | |
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISM LACK PROSECUTION NO APP, MTN GRANTED, ORDER SIGNED & FILED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: Letter sent to KATHY CHRISTENSEN returned - INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Motion MTN DISM-LACK PROSEC |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
December 07, 1987 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed COMPL - MUNI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.