Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by De Guzman, Nichol Alan, Esq., against Garcia, Karina, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeauchesne, Roger M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2019 |
Category3.740 Collections: Small Claims Juris Limited $0 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Statement of Venue
Date: March 19, 2019Civil Complaint
Date: March 19, 2019Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: August 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default Judgment | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Package Received | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default - Entered | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.