Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Trinity Management Services, Inc.,A California, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Jones, Lauren, against Does 1 - 10, Navarro,, Navarro, Manuel, represented by Pro Per, Pruitt, Allison, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Charles F. Haines presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Haines Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2022 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Trinity Management Services, Inc., a California corporation, against Manuel Navarro and Does 1-10. Trinity Management Services is suing for unlawful detainer, seeking possession of the premises located at 2...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68238090) | |
August 15, 2022 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 67924226): PRUITT, ALLISON SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR NAVARRO, MANUEL | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-15-2022 - CASE REPORTED SETTLED BY LAUREN JONES, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. (D501) | |
July 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Plaintiff Trinity Management Services, Inc.'S Motion To Further Compel Form Interrogatories - General, Set One And Form Interrogtroeis - Unlawful Detainer, Set One; Request For Sanction In The Amount Of $2,000.00
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-28-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, PLAINTIFF TRINITY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.,A CALIFORNIA NOTICE OF MOTION AND PLAINTIFF TRINITY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO FURTHER COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE AND FORM INTERROGTROEIS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES; CLERK: J. MURPHY; NOT REPORTED. (D501) | |
July 25, 2022 | Hearing |
UD JURY TRIALS
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | UD JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-25-2022 CONTINUED TO UD JURY TRIALS ON AUG-15-2022 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 501 FOR SETTLEMENT PROTECTIVE DATE. JAIMIE BOMBARD APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF. MANUEL NAVARRO APPEARED AS DEFENDANT IN PRO PER. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES; CLERK: KENNETH B. HUNT; NOT REPORTED. (D501) | |
July 21, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Plaintiff Trinity Management Services, Inc.'S Motion To Further Compel Form Interrogatories - General, Set One And Form Interrogtroeis - Unlawful Detainer, Set One; Request For Sanction In The Amount Of $2,000.00
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.