Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Caritas Management Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Torres, Francisco G., against Does 1 To 5, Jefferson, Eugene, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with James J. McBride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames J. McBride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2010 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time147 days |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: December 03, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JEFFERSON, EUGENE
Date: August 13, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT JEFFERSON, EUGENE | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT JEFFERSON, EUGENE THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 380 EDDY STREET #306, SAN FRANCISCO, CA $821.76 RENT, $400.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $310.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,531.76, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION SERVED AUG-07-2010, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION SERVED AUG-07-2010, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT JEFFERSON, EUGENE | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT JEFFERSON, EUGENE | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $7.26 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMNT PURSUANT TO STIP FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (AMENDED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARITAS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.