Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
San Francisco Housing Authority, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evje, Arnold Walter, against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Pettit, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time635 days |
ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2007NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: December 29, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT PETTIT, ELIZABETH | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $46.86 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PETTIT, ELIZABETH | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PETTIT, ELIZABETH THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 72 NICHOLS WAY, S.F. CA. 94124, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT PETTIT, ELIZABETH | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: LOST/UNAVAILABLE DOCUMENT - LEASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & PREJUDGMENT CLAIM FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY SERVED JAN-25-2007, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT PETTIT, ELIZABETH | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.