Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
San Francisco Housing Authority, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evje, Arnold Walter, against Does 1 To 10 Inclusive, Malepeai, Naumati, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MALEPEAI, NAUMATI | |
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $130.20 FOR TRANSACTION W2007130R004 (RENT DEPOSIT), PAYABLE TO SFHA, DOC #1900465207, TRUST TAG #31783, WARRANT #38000533, DATED MAR-14-2007 | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT MALEPEAI, NAUMATI | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | STAY OF EXECUTION PAID, TRUST RECEIPT NO. 31783 FILED BY DEFENDANT MALEPEAI, NAUMATI | |
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MALEPEAI, NAUMATI | |
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $18.60 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MALEPEAI, NAUMATI THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 7 HARBOR ROAD, S.F. CA. 94124, LEASE FORFEITED, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: LOST/UNAVAILABLE DOCUMENT ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY | |
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68511.3 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MALEPEAI, NAUMATI ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO CRC 3.50 - 3.63 (CRC 3.62) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.