Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Anderson Homes, Anthony Tile, Inc, Atmos Corporation, Barbosa Cabinets, Inc., Century Roofing Company, Inc, (total of 17) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Garcia, Israel E., against Anthony Tile, Inc., Atmos Corporation, B.A.S.S. Locsin Masonry, Inc., B&B Plumbing, Bolin Builders, (total of 29) See All represented by Dahl, Gregory G., Koper, Jacob, Martin, Suzanne M., Mayo, Brigitte M., Nunez, Elizabeth A., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Flanagan, Hugh M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFlanagan, Hugh M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management334 days |
Filing DateMay 23, 2008 |
Category(10): Unlimited Construction Defect |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Post-Dispo)
Judge: Flanagan, Hugh M. |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Converted Minute Order | |
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Post-Dispo)
Judge: Flanagan, Hugh M. |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Flanagan, Hugh M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.