Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Liu, Chi Feng 901,Bayshore Blvd,Unit, filed a(n) Money case against Guan, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Murlene J. Randle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMurlene J. Randle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT DENIED** | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT AND ANSWER FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, CHI FENG | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF LIU, CHI FENG IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT GUAN, KEVIN STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-25-2023 - JUDGMENT. | |
May 25, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO ALL THE CASE TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY LIU, CHI FENG GUAN, KEVIN | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAY-25-2023 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAY-25-2023 BY JUDGE PRO TEM LY. PLAINTIFF CHI FENG LIU IS PRESENT ASSISTED BY COURT CERTIFIED MANDARIN INTERPRETER AIDONG NI. DEFENDANT KEVIN GUAN IS PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: PANG LY; CLERK: R. SAHATJIAN. NOT REPORTED.(D506) | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$40.00 ) SERVED MAY-01-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GUAN, KEVIN | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE SERVICE FEE $40.(WAIVED) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LIU, CHI FENG AS TO DEFENDANT GUAN, KEVIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.