Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Visto, Shena Marie, filed a(n) Money case against Cano, Laura Po Box 347212 San Francisco, Ca, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Murlene J. Randle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMurlene J. Randle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF VISTO, SHENA MARIE IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT CANO, LAURA PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO ALLOW THE CASE TO BE HEARD BY A JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY VISTO, SHENA MARIE CANO, LAURA | |
May 24, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-24-2023 - JUDGMENT. | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAY-24-2023 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAY-24-2023 BY JUDGE PRO TEM LYNN. PLAINTIFF SHENA MARIE VISTO IS PRESENT. PLAINTIFF WITNESSES INCLUDE: CLAIRE VISTO, DAUGHTER; KENNETH NEAD. DEFENDANT LAURA CANO IS PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: PANG LYNN; CLERK: R. SAHATJIAN. NOT REPORTED.(D506) | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-17-2023, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT CANO, LAURA | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF VISTO, SHENA MARIE AS TO DEFENDANT CANO, LAURA | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF VISTO, SHENA MARIE AS TO DEFENDANT CANO, LAURA | |
February 07, 2023 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: MURLENE J. RANDLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.