Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Evseeva, Christina, filed a(n) Money case against Chislaasuren, Tserenkhand, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald S. Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
DECLARATION TO CHANGE DEFENDANTS ADDRESS FILED BY DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND
Date: February 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $431.55 RE 34625 FOR TRANSACTION W0417309D006 (DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT), PAYABLE TO CHRISTINA EVSEEVA, DOC #1908318879, WARRANT #38204856, DATED MAY-19-2017 | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED MAY-01-2017 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVSEEVA, CHRISTINA AS TO DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BY DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR OF DEPOSIT OF FILED BY DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION TO CHANGE DEFENDANTS ADDRESS FILED BY DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF EVSEEVA, CHRISTINA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CHISLAASUREN, TSERENKHAND $400.00 PRINCIPAL, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $430.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF FEB-23-2017 - JUDGMENT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.