Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wan, Lilian, filed a(n) Money case against Peninou French Laundry & Cleaners, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul Slavit presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Slavit Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time185 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | PLTFF'S EXHIBITS RETURNED. | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 28, 2007 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WAN, LILIAN IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT PENINOU FRENCH LAUNDRY & CLEANERS, INC. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SIGNED SENT TO TODD EDWARDS, PENINOU FRENCH LAUNDRY & CLEANERS INC. | |
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $878.00 FILED BY WAN, LILIAN AS TO DEFENDANT PENINOU FRENCH LAUNDRY & CLEANERS, INC. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR FEB-28-2007 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.