Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tov, Chhunleng, filed a(n) Money case against Tran, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time164 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED | |
April 09, 2007 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, JESSICA | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 09, 2007 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF TOV, CHHUNLENG RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TRAN, JESSICA $4,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $50.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,050.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, JESSICA | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $4,785.07 FILED BY TOV, CHHUNLENG AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, JESSICA ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR FEB-09-2007 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.