Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Antovich, Zachary C., filed a(n) Money case against American Airlines Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Paul Slavit presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Slavit Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 28, 2007 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ANTOVICH, ZACHARY C. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. $100.00 PRINCIPAL, $40.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $140.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SIGNED SENT TO CT CORP SYSTEM AGT FOR SERVICE FOR AMERICAN AIRLINES. | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $200.00 FILED BY ANTOVICH, ZACHARY C. AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR FEB-28-2007 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.