Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Robert Darrell Williams, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Second-Strike Filing | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.