Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rita Kathlene Dedios, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Booking Fee Form | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.