Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mcdaniel Iii, Swede Morris, Swede Morris Mcdaniel, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.