Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jason James Solomon, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Search Order | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Review Hearing
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.