Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Brian Scott Sparks, Sparks, Brian Scott, represented by Baker, Martin, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Valli K. Israels presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValli K. Israels Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Criminal Protective Order | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.