Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Grivette, John Anthony, John Anthony Grivette, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Valli K. Israels presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValli K. Israels Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Disposition Reporting | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | POTF at Disposition | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Sentenced | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Fees Sent To Collections | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.