Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Armstea, Jermaine, Berquist, Jill, Bhagat, Nasreen, Bicana, Margarita, Black, Lucretsia, (total of 83) See All filed a(n) Coordination case represented by Abramson, Brian, Azizi, Daniel, Barton, Kristen, Bokaie, Samira Jaqueline, Boundas, John T., (total of 7) See All represented by Brown, Cameron A., Burgess, Alexis N, Castella, Tomas, Connor, Colette, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with ANDREW Y.S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANDREW Y.S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2020 |
CategoryCoordination |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a court order related to a coordination proceeding involving Lyft rideshare cases in San Francisco County Superior Court. The court denies Lyft's request for a stay pending a petition to coordinate an add-on case, but grants Lyft's ...
NOTICE OF JUDICIAL MEDIATION (TRANS # 66061761)
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 66094960)
Date: November 09, 2020JOINT STATUS REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 66100189) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: November 12, 2020ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE NAMING OF ANONYMOUS PLAINTIFFS (TRANSACTION #66145317)
Date: November 30, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66154665) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: December 02, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66199584) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: December 18, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66214114) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: December 29, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66184606) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: December 14, 2020ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 66225254)
Date: January 04, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67681856) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 01, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67685002) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 02, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66293342) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: January 28, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66282655) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 25, 2021ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 66311696)
Date: February 01, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67735614) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 16, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67722020) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 13, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67740448) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: June 17, 2022ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #67758646)
Date: June 23, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67735610) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 20, 2022MINUTES FOR JUN-23-2022 10:30 AM
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER REGARDING FEBRUARY 18, 2021 HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66311696)
Date: February 04, 2021NOTICE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 66322548) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 09, 2021JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66333945) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66334123) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: February 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66349720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 17, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66366396) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 24, 2021ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 66372966)
Date: February 25, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66439993) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: March 19, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66478810) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 01, 2021ORDER REGARDING FACT SHEET IMPLEMENTATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66485724)
Date: April 05, 2021STIPULATION REGARDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 66964538) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 24, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66955040) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 22, 2021ORDER REGARDING ADDTITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID #67068234)
Date: November 03, 2021ORDER AFTER MARCH 30, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #67440938)
Date: March 30, 2022MINUTES FOR MAR-30-2022 9:00 AM
Date: March 30, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67368679) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: March 04, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66964538) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 24, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66972022) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 28, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67518599) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: April 28, 2022ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID # 67042809)
Date: October 25, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67368959) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: March 04, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67428165) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: March 25, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF JANE DOE (TRANSACTION ID # 67433205)
Date: March 28, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67521807) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: April 29, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67607431) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: May 10, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67596680) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: May 06, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67613924) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: May 12, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67920403) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: August 10, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68246660) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: October 12, 2022ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASE (TRANSACTION ID #68265477)
Date: October 17, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68218886) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: October 05, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67620427) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: May 13, 2022ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 30, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65850618) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: August 14, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65850775) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: August 14, 2020ORDER SUSTAINING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION 65865783)
Date: August 20, 2020JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66026305) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: October 15, 2020ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT AFTER 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION 65869106)
Date: August 21, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66028252) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER AFTER OCTOBER 21, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 66044042)
Date: October 21, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67625501) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: May 16, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (CGC-21-589616) (TRANSACTION ID # 68328722) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: October 31, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY COLETTE CONNOR TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY NOV-23-2022
Date: October 13, 2022ORDER & STIPULATION RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68341315)
Date: November 02, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67938128) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: August 16, 2022MINUTES FOR AUG-17-2022 9:00 AM
Date: August 17, 2022ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 17, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67942213) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ANA REYES (TRANSACTION ID # 68098249) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 13, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JESSE T. SMALLWOOD TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68142168) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY CAMERON A. BROWN TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68168642) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY RYAN L. GILES TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY MARGRET LECOCKE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY COLETTE CONNOR TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68168642) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 26, 2022STATUS UPDATE REGARDING JANE AJ DOE (TRANSACTION ID # 68177031) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY DAVID RISKIN TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY OCT-26-2022
Date: September 15, 2022MINUTES FOR SEP-30-2022 9:00 AM
Date: September 30, 2022JOINT CASE-MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68353755) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASE
Date: June 15, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68965207) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 23, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (CGC-21-589616) (TRANSACTION ID # 69014734) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 27, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (20STCV24962) (TRANSACTION ID # 68925708) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 18, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68948108) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER & STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE FOR THE SECOND BELLWETHER TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID #69021795)
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 14, 2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 69051459)
Date: February 01, 2023JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69106988) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 08, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69131869) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 10, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66520478) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 15, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66520479) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 15, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66686736) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER RE DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF JANE ROE 5 ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 66690082)
Date: June 15, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66694853) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: June 17, 2021ORDER - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 66571548)
Date: May 04, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66592902) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: May 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66798099) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: July 26, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66798611) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: July 26, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66594337) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: May 12, 2021ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION #66619297)
Date: May 20, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66914287) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID # 66922902)
Date: September 10, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66923859) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 13, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (TRANSACTION ID #67297554)
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER AFTER SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 66931653)
Date: September 14, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66677090) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: June 10, 2021JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67143383) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: December 06, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67344490) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 24, 2022ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PRIOR ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 66936013)
Date: September 15, 2021JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67227121) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 11, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67344396) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: February 24, 2022ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID #67237812)
Date: January 14, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67322606) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: February 16, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67275170) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 28, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67308306) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: February 10, 2022ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP 5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID #67149896)
Date: December 07, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66938982) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: September 16, 2021ORDER AFTER DECEMBER 8, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #67153512)
Date: December 08, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67920268) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: August 10, 2022NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY RYAN L. GILES TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY SEP-28-2022
Date: August 10, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67903063) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: August 04, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67776914) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 29, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67903068) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER & STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE FOR THE FIRST BELLWETHER TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID #69151537)
Date: February 14, 2023JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69594639)
Date: March 20, 2023MINUTES FOR MAR-23-2023 10:30 AM
Date: March 23, 2023ORDER AFTER NOVEMBER 8, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #68364056)
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER GRANTING LYFT'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON-CASE (TRANSACTION ID #68364056)
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (TRANSACTION ID #68364056)
Date: November 08, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68360881) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: November 07, 2022MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2022 10:00 AM
Date: November 08, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68363364) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: November 08, 2022JOINT STATEMENT RE BELLWETHER SELECTION (TRANSACTION ID # 68403296)
Date: November 17, 2022ORDER & STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE FOR THE FIRTS BELLWETHER TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 68510051)
Date: December 05, 2022ORDER RE: BELLWETHER SELECTION FOR APRIL 2023 TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID #68408430
Date: November 18, 2022ORDER & STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE FOR THE SECOND BELLWETHER CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 68716021)
Date: December 21, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68835817) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 09, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68892107) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP5061 AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION #68910812)
Date: January 17, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 70200613) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: June 14, 2023MINUTES FOR APR-13-2023 9:00 AM
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY THE PROCEEDING (TRANSACTION ID: 69856056)
Date: April 19, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69709934) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER APPOINTING A DISCOVERY REFEREE UNDER CCP 638, 644(B) (TRANSACTION 69719770)
Date: April 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69719604) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER GRANTING LYFT, INC.'S MOTION TO CONFIRM STAY (TRANSACTION ID #69722844)
Date: April 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69722517) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: April 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69967148) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-22-2023
Date: February 15, 2023ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION ID #69152066)
Date: February 14, 2023MINUTES FOR FEB-14-2023 10:00 AM
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER AFTER FEBRUARY 14, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #69151537)
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN EDDIE WILLIAMS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-22-2023
Date: February 15, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (20STCV24962) (TRANSACTION ID # 69234211) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER AFTER MARCH 23, 2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #69629526)
Date: March 23, 2023ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER (TRANSACTION ID #69262697)
Date: March 02, 2023MINUTES FOR APR-06-2023 10:30 AM
Date: April 06, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN 20STCV24962. (TRANSACTION ID # 70491913)
Date: July 26, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN 20STCV25025. (TRANSACTION ID # 70491913)
Date: July 26, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN RG20067815. (TRANSACTION ID # 70491913)
Date: July 26, 2023ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION 71941993)
Date: February 02, 2024NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 72023404) FILED BY ATTORNEY METLITZKY, WARREN
Date: February 13, 2024NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY BRIAN ABRAMSON TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-27-2024
Date: February 14, 2024ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION 71581292)
Date: December 08, 2023JOINT CASE-MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 71576408) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PLAINTIFFS
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY TOMAS CASTELLA TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY FEB-28-2024
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY FEB-28-2024
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY ADAM JOSHUA PODOLL TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY FEB-28-2024
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN EDDIE WILLIAMS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY FEB-28-2024
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASES (TRANSACTION 71880867)
Date: January 25, 2024DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-22-597764) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914022)
Date: September 21, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 70971846) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASE (TRANSACTION ID #71023143)
Date: October 04, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 70793916) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 05, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-21-594133) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914013)
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-21-594132) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914013)
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-21-589215) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914018)
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 70851446) FILED BY ATTORNEY NEHMENS, ANGELA J.
Date: September 13, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CGC-21-594133) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914018) AS TO PLAINTIFF DOE 22, JANE
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-21-594165) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914013)
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CGC-21-594133) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914013) AS TO PLAINTIFF DIAZ, KIA
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CGC-21-594133) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914018) AS TO PLAINTIFF DOE 24, JANE
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 70817448)
Date: September 07, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-19-578278) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914020)
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CGC-21-594133) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914018) AS TO PLAINTIFF DOE 28, JANE
Date: September 21, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION (CGC-20-588562) (TRANSACTION ID # 70914013)
Date: September 21, 2023MINUTES FOR DEC-08-2021 9:00 AM
Date: December 08, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67132511) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: November 30, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 67153869) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: December 08, 2021ORDER REGARDING ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP AND STAY OF CASE (TRANSACTION ID #71661033)
Date: December 19, 2023DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT IN CGC-21-588808. (TRANSACTION ID # 72208980)
Date: February 29, 2024ORDER ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID #67758646)
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER & STIPULATION RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER ON STIPULATIOIN TO STAY THE PROCEEDING (TRANSACTION ID: 69856056)
Date: April 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2025 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY MATTHEW JOHNSON
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 08, 2025 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY BRIAN ABRAMSON
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 08, 2025 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY TOMAS CASTELLA
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 11, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JOHN EDDIE WILLIAMS
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 11, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY ADAM JOSHUA PODOLL
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 11, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
August 14, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JESSE T. SMALLWOOD
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
August 14, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY DAVID RISKIN
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
August 14, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY COLETTE CONNOR
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
August 14, 2024 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY CAMERON A. BROWN
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.