Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by American Express Legal, against Does 1-10, Zhang, Yan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case name is "AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. YAN ZHANG" and the case number is CIVSB2215175. The document is a complaint, which means it i...
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 05, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 11, 2022Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: September 22, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 05, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Declaration re:
Date: August 03, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 04, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.