Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quinoez, Sonia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Oakwood Legal Group, Llp, against Carefest Medical Group, Carefirst Medical Group, Does 1-25, Wu & Diaz Prof Corp, represented by The Safarian Firm Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Sonia Quinonez against Carefirst Medical Group and Does 1-25. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including negligence, negligent hiring, supervision, and retention of an employee, sexual batter...
Stipulation Filed re:
Date: July 24, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 05, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed to 1st Amended Complaint |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Answer is being rejected due to Defendant Wu & Diaz Prof Corp no longer a party to the case. |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $9 visa paid on 7/26/23 |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed re: continuance |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: stip to continue |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Answer to 1st amended complaint |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 24.00cc paid on 7/20 for stip to continue |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed re First Amended Complaint |
|
January 30, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.