Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Garcia Salinas, Jamie, Rodriguez, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of John C Ye, against Caporale, Tom, Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc, Does 1 To 25, represented by Law Offices Of Beth M Henderson, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed filed by defendants on 12/04/23 |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Trial Setting Conference |
|
July 24, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of 01/25/2023 Minute Order and Notice of case re-assignment to for all purposes to Department S14. |
|
January 25, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Discovery Conference Order |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Discovery Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.