Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hernandez, Katherine Marie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Gilbert Maturino, against Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, County Of San Bernardino, Does 1-25, Kim Do, Jennifer, Lyons M.D., John Michael, (total of 5) See All represented by Thompson & Colegate Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed filed by Plaintiff filed on 11/13/23 |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Stipulation of Parties to Continue the Voluntary Court Sponsored Mediation |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant With Prejudice |
|
May 23, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $4 cc paid fo fax rec;d 05/09/23 |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received ITSCS |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant Arrowhead Regional Medical Center; with prejudice filed by Plaintiff filed on 2/3/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.