We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

In Re Petition Of J.G. Wentworth Originationss, Llc Print

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago

J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Unclassified - Unclassified case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardinowith Thomas S Garza presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

June 30, 2022

Last Refreshed

October 14, 2022

Filing Location

San Bernardino County, CA

Filing Court House

San Bernardino

Judge

Thomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Petition To Transfer Structured Settlement Payment Rights

Practice Area

Unclassified

Matter Type

Unclassified

Case Documents

Notice of Hearing Filed

Date: June 30, 2022

Petition Filed (Civil)

Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00

Amended Document Filed re:

Date: August 17, 2022

Proof of Service

Date: August 17, 2022

Amended Document Filed re:

Date: August 30, 2022

Declaration Filed

Date: August 30, 2022

Amended Document Filed re:

Date: September 08, 2022

Amended Petition Filed

Date: September 08, 2022

Case Events

Type Description
Department S27 - SBJC

Judge: Garza, Thomas S

Docket Event Amended Document Filed re:
Declaration of Payee in Support of Petitioner's Petition of Payment Rights filed by Petitioner filed 9/8/2022
Docket Event Amended Petition Filed
for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights filed by Petitioner filed 9/8/2022
Docket Event Amended Document Filed re:
***second amended*** Exhibit "A" to petition for approval for transfer of payments
Docket Event Declaration Filed
of payee in support of petition for approval for transfer of payment rights
Docket Event Amended Document Filed re:
Amended Exhibits "A" and "B" to petition for approval for transfer of payment rights filed on 08/17/2022
Docket Event Proof of Service
of petition, ntc of hearing on petition, amended exhibits
Docket Event Notice of Hearing Filed
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Docket Event Certificate of Assignment Received
See all events