Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Foell & Elder, against Ayo, Yamilet, Barajas, Juan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case is titled Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. vs. Juan Barajas, with the case number CIVSB2213350. The document is a complaint, and it appears ...
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 15, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: January 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons/Comp Unserved Electronically Fil | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: OSC Default Judgment / Sanctions | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
July 28, 2023 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default Judgment |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Notice of re-assignment of case for all purposes was recieved and is undeliverable without a forwarding address |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: Filed by Plaintiff Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. against Defendant Juan Barajas on Complaint filed 7/27/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.