Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ruiz, Armando Carlos, Ruiz, Guillermina, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Robinson, Camerine Shannell, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 26, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Minute Order |
|
October 26, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Copy of M/O 07/27/23 Undeliverable |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Important correspondence undeliverable |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Minute Order |
|
July 27, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute Order 4/14/23 |
|
April 14, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Untitled Document, Request and Order to Waive Court Fees : The pleading paper submitted does not have the filing party's information, case name, case number or a document title. Please seek legal advice or conduct research in regards to answering this civil suit. The filing party should not complete the Order on Court Fee Waiver, as they are neither a clerk nor a judicial officer. The filing party only needs to include their information in tem 1. on the Order on Court Fee Waiver. Additionally, "Received" stamps should not be placed on the front pages of a document, please only place a "Received" stamp on the back of the first page of the document. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.