Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ahlborn, James, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Barkodar Law Group P.C., Winston Law Group, P.C., against Building Materials Manufacturing Corporation, Does 1-50, represented by Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart P.C., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, James Ahlborn, is an individual representing the State of California as a private attorney general. The defendant is Bui...
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 26, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 01, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 09, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.