Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palisades Collection, L.L.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson, Llp, against Malik Stewart, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management149 days |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2005 |
CategoryContract - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORIGINALS SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT OF PALISADES COLLECTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL & PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
April 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Completed |
|
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: CMC STATEMENT Not Applicable |
|
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ATTY FOR PLA Not Applicable |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE Vacated |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY Not Applicable |
|
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.