Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cir Law Offices, against Denise D. Holt, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management141 days |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2005 |
CategoryCollection Case |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Vacated |
|
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE HEARING - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Completed |
|
December 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE Vacated |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN Not Applicable |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/21/05 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.