Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Money case represented by Davis, Shedrick O, against Jill Olsen, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Lewis A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLewis A. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2005 |
CategoryMoney |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
OFFICIAL COURT FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC68152 AND GC68153 Not Applicable |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Vacated |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY Not Applicable |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE HEARING - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Completed |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE Vacated |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS ORANGE Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
CONTINUED RECEIPT Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.