Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Laughlin, Lindsey Marie filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Palvir Shoker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalvir Shoker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY LINDSEY MARIE LAUGHLIN - Minutes GRANTED |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: LINDSEY MARIE LAUGHLIN / ORDER EXPIRES: 10/07/20 Not Applicable |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 08/05/2019 OF LINDSEY LAUGHLIN AS TO RICHARD MURRAY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/07/19 Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PALVIR SHOKER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 08/05/2019 OF LINDSEY LAUGHLIN AS TO RICHARD MURRAY, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/09/19 Not Applicable |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY LINDSEY MARIE LAUGHLIN - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY LINDSEY MARIE LAUGHLIN - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING IS GRANTED Not Applicable |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.