Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Torrez, Javier H., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Ackermann & Tilajef, P.C, Melmed Law Group Pc, against Mckesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., A Virgina Corporation, represented by Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management256 days |
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions296 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: June 20, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 17, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 21, 2020Notice
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Status Report Filed
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Filed
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Tentative decisions
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Tentative decisions
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Status Report Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Report Filed
Date: March 21, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.