Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lively, Steven, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Nejat Kohan, against C&H Trust Deed Services A Business Entity Of Unknown Form, Grief Relief Now A Business Entity Of Unknown Form, represented by Halavais & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time88 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 07, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 07, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Waived for FILING FEE WAIVED ON STEVEN LIVELY FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $43.00. |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX PARTE HEARING RE: TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL JOHN M TOMBERLIN,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY KANDT COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ;12225 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: PLAINTIFF STEVEN LIVELY PRESENT PAULINE HADDADIN PRESENT. ATTORNEY COBY R. HALAVAI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR C&H TRUST DEED SERVICES, GRIEF RELIEF NOW. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED - MOTION IS DENIED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S MARCH 5, 2019 RULING. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Filed EX PARTE TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL FILED. |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 191002-0816-CS FFS/ 0.69 TSB/ 0.06 PAYMT | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY STEVEN LIVELY. |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY STEVEN LIVELY IS GRA |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Waived for FILING FEE WAIVED ON STEVEN LIVELY FOR EX PARTE FEES (4 MATTERS) IN THE AMOUNT OF $270.00. |
|
June 10, 2019 | |||
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.