Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California By And Through The Commissioner, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Department Of Business Oversight, against Kayatta, David Francis, Logos Lifetime Enterprises, Llca California Limited Liability Company, Logos Management Group, Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Logos Real Estate Holdings, Llca California Limited Liability Company, Logos Wealth Advisors, Inc A California Corporation, (total of 10) See All represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2015 |
CategorySecurities Litigation-Complex |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions219 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time236 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 09, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 09, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: September 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: 5 ORIG ABSTRACTS ISSUED RE PAUL MATA/FEE EXEMPT |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT AMOUNT DOES NOT MATCH AMOUNT ON SIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER. |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File NOTICE OF TRUSTEES APPLICATION TO EMPLOY LEA ACCOU NTANCY LLP AS ACCOUNTANT PLACED IN FILE |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File SVC COPY OF NTC OF MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SUBSTANTIVE CONSOLIDATION PLACED IN FILE |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE'S NOTICE OF W/DRAWAL OF NOTICE TO EMPLOY RE BROKER FILED. |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF APPLICATION BY CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE RE: DEFENDANT'S BANKRUPCTY CASE FILED. |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF POSSIBLE DIVIDEND FROM RIVERSIDE BANKRUPTCY COURT, CASE #6:16-BK-19029-MJ FILED. |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF "US SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S NTC OF APPEARANCE" IN PAUL MATAS'S BK CASE FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.