Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lawson, Linda, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Tutor Time Child Care Learningcenters, Gfgtt Holdins Inc, Gfgtt Holdings Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2005 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Cycle Time2890 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/24/2006: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) Hearing: VACATED | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/15/2006: HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT of LAWSON FILED BY GFGTT HOLDINGS INC Hearing: VACATED | |
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/15/2006: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT of LAWSON BY GFGTT HOLDINGS INC Hearing: VACATED | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/14/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/20/2006: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE filed by GFGTT HOLDINS INC, TUTOR TIME CHILD CARE LEARNING CENTERS, GFGTT HOLDINGS INC | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/20/2006: Amended NOTICE OF DEMURRER filed by TUTOR TIME CHILD CARE LEARNING CENTERS, GFGTT HOLDINS INC, GFGTT HOLDINGS INC | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/09/2006: Amended NOTICE OF DEMURRER filed by GFGTT HOLDINS INC, TUTOR TIME CHILD CARE LEARNING CENTERS | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/09/2006: Original Summons returned as to COMPLAINT of LAWSON | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/09/2006: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE filed by GFGTT HOLDINS INC, TUTOR TIME CHILD CARE LEARNING CENTERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.