Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Sullivan, Julia Ruth, against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Latrille, Martin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne-Christine Massullo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by State Farm General Insurance Company against Martin Latrille and Does 1 through 20. State Farm is an insurance carrier licensed in California. The complaint alleges that Martin Latrille, who is the neighbor of State Farm's ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-05-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210031916) | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210027444) TO PLAINTIFF STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210027444) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210027444) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT LATRILLE, MARTIN DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-05-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-03-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-12-2023 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.