Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert S, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Morales, Byron O, represented by Le, Sylvanna Uyen, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne-Christine Massullo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff, OneMain Financial Group, LLC, is alleging breach of a promissory note, open book account, and account stated against the defendant, Byron O Morales. ...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100193314) FILED BY DEFENDANT MORALES, BYRON O
Date: March 10, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210027607) TO PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
Date: December 12, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100193314) FILED BY DEFENDANT MORALES, BYRON O
Date: March 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2024 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 08, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-08-2024 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED 12/12/223. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON NOV-26-2024 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC | |
September 13, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-08-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-13-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-13-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | FEES PAID FOR STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210040959) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT MORALES, BYRON O | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100193314) FILED BY DEFENDANT MORALES, BYRON O | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100193314) FILED BY DEFENDANT MORALES, BYRON O |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.