Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Onemain Financial Group, Llc,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gin, Mary, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Landos Ramirez, Luis O, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Nelson & Kennard, attorneys for the plaintiff, OneMain Financial Group, LLC, et al. The complaint is against Luis O Landos Ramirez and Does 1 to 10. The plaintiff alleges that they are a lawfully organized corporation and t...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 210041216) | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 210032599) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT LUIS O LANDOS RAMIREZ (TRANSACTION ID # 210030190) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT LUIS O LANDOS RAMIREZ (TRANSACTION ID # 210030196) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT LUIS O LANDOS RAMIREX (TRANSACTION ID # 210030095) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210027605) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 AS TO DEFENDANT LANDOS RAMIREZ, LUIS O DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2023 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210027605) TO PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210027605) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 210027605) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.