Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gilmore, Paul V., Westbay Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc., A, Stewart Title Of California, Inc., A Corporation, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints (Complaint In Interpleader) case represented by Dreyfuss, Lawrence J, against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Gilmore, Paul V., Westbay Commercial Real Estate Group, Inc., A, represented by Pro Per, Tursi, Joseph Gerald, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with CHARLES F. HAINES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES F. HAINES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Complaint In Interpleader) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Paul V. Gilmore against Westbay Commercial Real Estate Group Inc. and other defendants. The complaint alleges that the defendants acted in bad faith by demanding half of the commission fee for a commercial real estate sale....
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 17, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GILMORE, PAUL V.
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 19, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for January 19, 2024 line 1. CROSS COMPLAINANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMM... | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100208497) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION | |
August 03, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs
Judge: CHARLES F. HAINES |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IS GRANTED AS REQUESTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. JUDGE: CHARLES F. HAINES ; CLERK: L. YOUNG ; NOT REPORTED. (D501) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-03-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF PAUL V. GILMORE FILED ON JUNE 23, 2023) (TRANSACTION ID # 100207525) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WESTBAY COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLDWELL BANKER COMMERICAL WESTBAY REAL ESTATE GROUP | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
July 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge And Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-20-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.