Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Trotter, Lori, Trotter, Steven, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Daniels, Bill, Strauss, Randall E, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Pacific Gas And Electric Company, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne-Christine Massullo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryEminent Domain |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Steven and Lori Trotter against Pacific Gas and Electric Company (PG&E) and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges damages suffered by the plaintiffs due to the Dixie Fire and Fly Fire, which merged together. The Dixie Fi...
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-25-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR - JCCP 5208. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-25-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR - JCCP 5208. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100212639) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TROTTER, STEVEN TROTTER, LORI | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED JUN-19-2023, SERVED JUN-09-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 70377513) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TROTTER, STEVEN TROTTER, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
June 28, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-28-2023 CONTINUED TO OCT-25-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100200975): STRAUSS, RANDALL E ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR TROTTER, STEVEN TROTTER, LORI | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 69015595) TO PLAINTIFF TROTTER, STEVEN TROTTER, LORI | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | EMINENT DOMAIN, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69015595) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TROTTER, STEVEN TROTTER, LORI AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-28-2023 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 69015595) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TROTTER, STEVEN TROTTER, LORI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.