Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Dotson, Adeajai, Dotson, Lukman, Habibvand, Ali, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Pyle, Hunter, Ullman, Bree A., against Does 1 To 20 Inclusive, Euromotors, Inc., Sparrow, Darin, represented by Lordan, Joseph R., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with SAMUEL K. FENG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSAMUEL K. FENG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a declaration by Debbie Ruble in support of Defendant Euromotors, Inc. dba Mercedes-Benz of San Francisco's petition to compel arbitration. Debbie Ruble states that she has personal knowledge of the facts and is competent to testify...
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS
Date: July 06, 2022ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: May 13, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DISCOVERY DEADLINES
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 68219807) FILED BY ATTORNEY PYLE, HUNTER
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-07-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 68602627) EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 68219807) FILED BY ATTORNEY PYLE, HUNTER | |
September 21, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-21-2022 - CASE SETTLED. NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED 9/19/22. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON FEB-07-2023 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68125677) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOTSON, LUKMAN DOTSON, ADEAJAI HABIBVAND, ALI | |
September 07, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 07, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 06, 2022 | Hearing |
MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.