Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Mota, Roberto, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Miller, Andrew Scott, Panto, Arcolina, against Does 1 To 10, Huey, Joanne, represented by Hawkyard, Edgar William, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with GARRETT L. WONG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGARRETT L. WONG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a response to an unverified complaint filed by plaintiff Roberto Pablo Mota against defendant Joanne Huey and Does 1-10 in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The defendant denies all allegations made by the p...
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 66494293) FILED BY MOTA, ROBERTO
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-12-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 210050774) | |
September 12, 2023 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-12-2023 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 70735093) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOTA, ROBERTO | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY DEFENDANT HUEY, JOANNE FEE DEPOSITED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR JURY FEE FOR JUL-14-2023 THROUGH JUL-17-2023 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 502 | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOTA, ROBERTO FEE DEPOSITED BY RAINS LUCIA STERN ST. PHALLE & SILVER, PC FOR JURY FEE FOR JUL-14-2023 THROUGH JUL-17-2023 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 502 | |
July 17, 2023 | Hearing |
JURY TRIAL
Judge: JEFFREY S. ROSS |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF EUSTACE DE ST PHALLE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIMINE NO 21 (TRANSACTION ID # 70401708) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOTA, ROBERTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.