Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lee, Christina, Vargas, Amy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Horowitz, Michael A., against Ayesh, Eid Nayef, Chung, Miran, Does 1 To 20, Lee, Christina, represented by Daley, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions342 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
This complaint document is a proof of service filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The document is dated June 3, 2020, and it is a request for dismissal of the plaintiff's complaint. The proof of service indicates that ...
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100097403) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGAS, AMY
Date: February 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-29-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, CHRISTINA (TRANSACTION ID # 65881768) | |
August 11, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-11-2020 CONTINUED TO SEP-29-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT TO DISMISS CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL, M. DALEY. | |
June 30, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-30-2020 CONTINUED TO AUG-11-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610, FOR CROSS COMPLAINANTS TO DISMISS CROSS COMPLAINTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100103604) | |
May 19, 2020 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-19-2020 CONTINUED TO JUN-30-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.