Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Ferraris, Todd J., filed a(n) Civil Rights case represented by Derby, Steven Leo, Herrington, Joan, Falcone, Elizabeth A., against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Hue, Jeffrey D., United Parcel Service, Inc., Ferraris, Todd J., represented by Barrick, Cara F., Falcone, Elizabeth A., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Gerardo C. Sandoval presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerardo C. Sandoval Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff, Todd J Ferraris, is suing United Parcel Service, Inc., and others. The document states that copies of the summons, compla...
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RETURN OR DESTROY EXHIBITS | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 70467040) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FERRARIS, TODD J. AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $7,956.20 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO STEVEN DERBY, WARRANT #38207380, DATED MAY-17-2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100195503) FILED BY CROSS-APPELLANT FERRARIS, TODD J. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (APPEAL FILED 12-28-22)(TRANSACTION ID # 210032935) FILED BY APPELLANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED (APPEAL FILED 12-28-22)(TRANSACTION ID # 210032935) BY APPELLANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED [CROSS-APPPEAL FILED 1/12/2023](TRANSACTION ID # 100195503) BY CROSS-APPELLANT FERRARIS, TODD J. | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 210030034) FILED BY DEFENDANT HUE, JEFFREY D. | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED (TRANSACTION ID # 210029698) BY CROSS-APPELLANT FERRARIS, TODD J. | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF FERRARIS, TODD J. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. $165,883.00 PRINCIPAL, $959,466.72 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,125,349.72, SEE SCANNED DOC (TRANSACTION #69169511) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.