Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Asturias, Elena, Paniagua, Eduardo, Bear Bruin Ventures, Inc., Hamilton, Zoe, Milestone Financial, Llc, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Adelaars, Sarah, Cohen, Harris L, Davitt, Vincent J., Lau, Joyce K., Marquez, Victor Manuel, (total of 7) See All against Bear Bruin Ventures, Inc., Does 1 To 100 Inclusive, Hamilton, Zoe, Milestone Financial, Llc, Stuart, Carolyn T., (total of 7) See All represented by Burns, Elkanah J., Cohen, Harris L, Davitt, Vincent J., Lau, Joyce K., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Curtis E.A. Karnow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCurtis E.A. Karnow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2018 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time426 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Eduardo Paniagua and Elena Asturias against Milestone Financial LLC, Bear Bruin Ventures Inc., William R. Stuart, Carolyn T. Stuart, and Zoe Hamilton. The plaintiffs allege fraud, negligence, violation of C...
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES
Date: July 26, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: October 04, 2022ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AGAINST ELENA ASTURIA
Date: May 19, 2023CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 6/5/23)
Date: June 07, 2023ORDER (CONTINUING TRIAL)
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS
Date: June 20, 2023ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE REBUTTAL EXPERT WITNESS
Date: August 10, 2023CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2023MINUTES FOR SEP-13-2023 9:00 AM
Date: September 13, 2023ORDER PRETRIAL ORDER INCLUDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION #70879823)
Date: September 15, 2023ORDER PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (TRANSACTION #70715236)
Date: August 24, 2023MINUTES FOR AUG-24-2023 2:00 PM
Date: August 24, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 13, 2018REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A157183 DIV 2
Date: January 21, 2021CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 25, 2019CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $140.00
Date: August 21, 2019CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: September 10, 2019REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A157183 DIV 2
Date: March 18, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-24-2021 9:30 AM
Date: May 24, 2021MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2023 9:00 AM
Date: November 08, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100216775)
Date: October 20, 2023STATEMENT OF DECISION (TRANSACTION #71734700)
Date: January 03, 2024MINUTES FOR NOV-06-2023 10:00 AM
Date: November 06, 2023STATEMENT OF DECISION SUPPLEMENT NO. 1 TO THE STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: February 01, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100223385) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS
Date: December 22, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100222722) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS
Date: December 15, 2023MINUTES FOR OCT-25-2023 10:30 AM
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER OF DISMISSAL VACATED (A167980 DIV 2)
Date: November 28, 2023ORDER - POST TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 08, 2023MINUTES FOR JAN-30-2024 9:00 AM
Date: January 30, 2024MINUTES FOR OCT-24-2023 9:00 AM
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER AND STIPULATION RE POST TRIAL BRIEFING
Date: November 28, 2023MINUTES FOR OCT-26-2023 1:30 PM
Date: October 26, 2023FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION SUPPLEMENT NO. 2 TO THE STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: February 14, 2024ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (A167980 DIV 2)
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER ON JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Amended Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike And/Or Tax Memorandum Of Costs ***Per April 22, 2024 Order****
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
May 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Defendants' Second Amended Notice Of Motion And Notice Of Hearing On Motion For Attoneys' Fees Against Eduardo Paniagua
Judge: CURTIS KARNOW |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ***PER APRIL 22, 2024 ORDER**** (TRANSACTION ID # 210077024) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS HEARING SET FOR MAY-10-2024 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 611 | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 210077024) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS (TRANSACTION #72803966) | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 210076323) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS DATE: TBD TIME: TBD DEPT: 611 (TRANSACTION ID # 210076323) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 210076323) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR TAX MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 210076323) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PANIAGUA, EDUARDO INDIVIDUALS | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTONEYS' FEES AGAINST EDUARDO PANIAGUA, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 210075206) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILESTONE FINANCIAL, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION BEAR BRUIN VENTURES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION STUART, WILLIAM R. AN INDIVIDUAL STUART, CAROLYN T. AN INDIVIDUAL HAMILTON, ZOE AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR MAY-10-2024 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 611 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.