Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
1 San Antonio I5, Llc filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against 1025 Steiner I2 Llc, 1025 Sutter I5, Llc, 1035 Sutter I3, Lp, 1064 Dolores I1 Llc, 1064 Dolores I1 Llc,, (total of 56) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions166 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a third amended complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiffs in this case are Lance Evander, Miriam Palm, John Dessing, John Jay Parrish, Landra Tankha, Jon E. Christenson, Anne Lukanc...
ORDER RE: TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SANDERS, JASON HUGHES, JOHN TALAGA, DOLLY NORMAN, FLORENCE TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT VERITAS INVESTMENTS, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss The Action Of The Non-Complying Plaintiffs For Their Failure To Comply With The Courts Previous Discovery Orders; Request For Sanctions
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-03-2022 - ***CASE IS DISMISSED*** ABRAM PETERSEN, ESQ. OF LUBIN OLSON & NIEWIADOMSKI LLP APPEARING FOR DEFENDANTS VERITAS INVESTMENTS, INC., ET AL. VIA COURTCALL. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER AT TRIAL CALL. THE COURT TOOK THE MATTER OFF CALENDAR, TRIAL DATE IS VACATED. THE COURT DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE ONLY REMAINING PARTIES IN THE CASE - PLAINTIFFS MARIA PECK UC, VICTOR PECH, ANTONIO GODOY, ROBERT MCCRADY, RAQUEL DOMINGUEZ. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION OF THE NON-COMPLYING PLAINTIFFS FOR THEIR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S PREVIOUS DISCOVERY ORDERS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, TRANSFERRED FROM DEPT. 302 ON 09/30/22 AND CONTINUED TO DEPT. 206, IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR BY THE COURT. JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206) | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON OCT-03-2022 IN DEPT. 206, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION OF THE NON-COMPLYING PLAINTIFFS FOR THEIR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S PREVIOUS DISCOVERY ORDERS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS OFF CALENDAR PER 10/03/22 TRIAL CALL. (206) | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-03-2022 - ***CASE IS DISMISSED*** ABRAM PETERSEN, ESQ. OF LUBIN OLSON & NIEWIADOMSKI LLP APPEARING FOR DEFENDANTS VERITAS INVESTMENTS, INC., ET AL. VIA COURTCALL. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER AT TRIAL CALL. THE COURT TOOK THE MATTER OFF CALENDAR, TRIAL DATE IS VACATED. THE COURT DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE ONLY REMAINING PARTIES IN THE CASE - PLAINTIFFS MARIA PECK UC, VICTOR PECH, ANTONIO GODOY, ROBERT MCCRADY, RAQUEL DOMINGUEZ. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION OF THE NON-COMPLYING PLAINTIFFS FOR THEIR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTÂ’S PREVIOUS DISCOVERY ORDERS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, TRANSFERRED FROM DEPT. 302 ON 09/30/22 AND CONTINUED TO DEPT. 206, IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR BY THE COURT. JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206) | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON OCT-03-2022 IN DEPT. 206, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION OF THE NON-COMPLYING PLAINTIFFS FOR THEIR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTÂ’S PREVIOUS DISCOVERY ORDERS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS OFF CALENDAR PER 10/03/22 TRIAL CALL. (206) | |
September 30, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss The Action Of The Non-Complying Plaintiffs For Their Failure To Comply With The Courts Previous Discovery Orders; Request For Sanctions
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY 302, HEARING ON DEFENDANT VERITAS INVESTMENTS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE ACTION OF THE NON-COMPLYING PLAINTIFFS FOR THEIR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S PREVIOUS DISCOVERY ORDERS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS HELD. NON-STIP BY DEFENDANT. THE MOTION IS CONTINUED TO MONDAY, OCTOBER 3, 2022 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 206 TO TRAIL THE PENDING TRIAL. JUDGE PRO TEM LYNN TO PREPARE A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. JUDGE PRO TEM: WILLIAM LYNN. CLERK: JACQUELINE ALAMEDA. MATTER NOT REPORTED. (302/JPT) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-30-2022 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.