Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
A J Family, Llc, Albright, Deane A, Albright, Judy, Anes, Eileen, Ascentia Hedge Fund Lp, (total of 45) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Baker, Ryan G., Banchero, Ernest Jeffrey, Cotchett, Joseph Winters, against Does 1 To 20, represented by Baker, Ryan G., Banchero, Ernest Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John E. Munter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn E. Munter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management342 days |
Filing DateJune 08, 2012 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions651 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1168 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The document is filed in a case between Jerome F. Sheldon and John Rogers, with additional defendants listed as Does 1 through 20. The c...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 54447245) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHELDON, JEROME F
Date: October 25, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED A143315 DIV 4 | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. (A143315 DIV. 4) | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, 6 VOLS RT (APPEAL FILED 10/15/14, A143315 DIV 4) | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - GENERAL ORDER RE CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56455115) | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - AUTHORIZATION TO RE-ASSIGN CASES AND PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 56455069) | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT - CROW - COLLINS - KEEN - SCANLAN - SHAINLINE | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF D. WARNER RE PAYMENT OF FEES FOR REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 56253128) FILED BY APPELLANT ROGERS, JOHN | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 56246312)[8.124] FILED BY APPELLANT ROGERS, JOHN | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.